Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tunis

Archidioecesis Tunetanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ilario Antoniazzi, Archbishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 May 2010
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tunisia
  • Square Kilometers: 162,155 (62,632 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesetunisie.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 4 rue d'Alger, 1000 Tunis R.P., Tunisie
  • Telephone: 71.335.831
  • Fax: 71.333.832

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Tunis
1843ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tunis (erected)
Archdiocese of Carthage
10 November 1884ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tunis Archdiocese of Carthage
Territorial Prelature of Tunis
9 July 1964Name ChangedArchdiocese of Carthage Territorial Prelature of Tunis
Diocese of Tunis
31 May 1995ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Tunis Diocese of Tunis
Archdiocese of Tunis
22 May 2010ElevatedDiocese of Tunis Archdiocese of Tunis

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Carthage
1949280,0003,230,9508.7%80901701,64780500238ap1951
195970,0003,800,0001.8%889117939111554778ap1960
Territorial Prelature of Tunis
197035,0004,960,000.7%3746834217141021ap1971
197718,0005,870,000.3%26356129515225024ap1981
198815,5007,300,000.2%1929483223819815ap1991
Diocese of Tunis
199922,0009,200,000.2%1322356283316813ap2000
200022,0009,200,000.2%1330435113916013ap2001
200122,0009,500,000.2%1221336662816512ap2002
200222,00010,000,000.2%1117287852415312ap2003
200320,0009,673,600.2%1117287142213912ap2004
200420,0009,700,000.2%1321345882513911ap2005
Archdiocese of Tunis
201021,00011,000,000.2%11213265612712110ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013