Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Étienne Gazaniol

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

Titular Bishop of Modra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1845Born
20 Oct 186722.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 189146.8SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
26 Feb 189246.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
26 Feb 189246.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
5 Jun 189247.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
13 Oct 189651.6SelectedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Dec 189651.7ConfirmedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
22 May 191368.2ResignedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
22 May 191368.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
18 May 191772.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Jules-Étienne Gazaniol (VIAF: 309811678)
Bishop Jules-Étienne Gazaniol (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
Ordained BishopCarthage, Archdiocese of Carthage, Tunisia

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • 4t01: CB, 31 Jul 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 223, and Page 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017