Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Barthélemy Clément Combes

Deceased

Archbishop of Carthage, Tunisia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1839Born
2 Jul 186424.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 188141.3SelectedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
13 May 188141.6ConfirmedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
9 Oct 188142.0Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
16 Jun 189353.7AppointedArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia
28 Nov 190869.1AppointedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
2 Jan 191777.2ResignedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
20 Feb 192282.3DiedArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy Clément Combes (VIAF: 88639289)
Archbishop Barthélemy Clément Combes (born , died ) Archbishop of Carthage

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseillette, France

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 185, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 47
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017