Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Prosper Auguste Dusserre

Deceased

Archbishop of Alger, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1833Born
16 Feb 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 187845.2SelectedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
13 Sep 187845.3ConfirmedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
15 Dec 187845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
13 Feb 188046.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Alger, Algeria
27 Feb 188046.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Alger, Algeria
27 Feb 188046.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
27 Feb 188046.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
Jul 188148.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
25 Nov 189259.5SucceededArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
30 Dec 189764.6DiedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Prosper Auguste Dusserre
Archbishop Prosper Auguste Dusserre (born , died ) Archbishop of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvesnelles, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 89, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017