Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Géraud-Marie Soubrier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oran, Algeria

Titular Archbishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1826Born
7 Apr 184923.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 188660.1SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
10 Jun 188660.4ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
2 Oct 188660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
24 Mar 189872.1ResignedBishop of Oran, Algeria
24 Mar 189872.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Samosata
11 Aug 189973.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Géraud-Marie Soubrier
Archbishop Géraud-Marie Soubrier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadailhac
Ordained BishopSt. Philippe, Cathedral, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 427, and Page 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017