Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe Le Chaptois, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1852BornCuillé, France
6 Oct 187826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
19 Jun 189139.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania
19 Jun 189139.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
20 May 189442.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
30 Nov 191765.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Adolphe Le Chaptois:
Bishop Adolphe Le Chaptois M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013