Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin Guillemé, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa, Malawi

Titular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1859Born
22 Sep 188324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
24 Feb 191151.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
24 Feb 191151.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
18 Jun 191151.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
27 Jun 193474.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
7 Apr 194282.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Mathurin Guillemé
Bishop Mathurin Guillemé M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte Marie-de-Redon, France

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast