Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Stanislas Dupont, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa

Titular Bishop of Thibaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1850BornGesté, France
21 Dec 187828.4Ordained PriestPriest
1879¹28.4ProfessedPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
16 Feb 189746.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
16 Feb 189746.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibaris
15 Aug 189747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibaris
28 Feb 191160.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nyassa, Malawi
19 Mar 193079.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa, Malawi

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Stanislas Dupont:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Stanislas Dupont M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyassa

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013