Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Marie-Ange Vigne

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1826Born
25 May 185023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valence, France
14 Mar 187649.2SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
3 Apr 187649.3ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
27 May 187649.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
7 Feb 188053.1SelectedBishop of Digne, France
27 Feb 188053.1ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
12 May 188053.4InstalledBishop of Digne, France
5 Feb 188558.1SelectedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
27 Mar 188558.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
10 May 188558.4InstalledArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
9 Nov 189568.9DiedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph-Marie-Ange Vigne
Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Marie-Ange Vigne (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrignan, Diocese of Valence
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valence, Diocese of Valence

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 245
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017