Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Joseph Dabert

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1811Born
28 May 183624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Viviers, France
23 May 186351.6SelectedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
28 Sep 186352.0ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
22 Nov 186352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
1 Dec 186352.1InstalledBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
28 Feb 190189.4DiedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Joseph Dabert (VIAF: 14915594)
Bishop Nicolas-Joseph Dabert (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHenrichemont
Ordained BishopCathedral, Viviers, Diocese of Viviers

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 449
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017