Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe-Ernest Bonjean, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1823Born
11 Dec 184623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 Jul 186844.7SelectedVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
24 Jul 186844.8ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
24 Jul 186844.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
24 Aug 186844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
20 Apr 188359.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
25 Nov 188663.1AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
3 Aug 189268.8DiedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Christophe-Ernest Bonjean (VIAF: 52775783)
Archbishop Christophe-Ernest Bonjean O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiom, Diocese of Clermont, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours, France

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217, and Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017