Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André-Théophile Mélizan, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Colombo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1844BornMarseille, France
1864¹19.6ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Aug 187935.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
8 Aug 187935.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Adana
24 Jan 188035.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adana
20 Apr 188338.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
25 Nov 188642.5AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
5 Mar 189348.8AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
27 Jun 190561.1DiedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André-Théophile Mélizan:
Archbishop André-Théophile Mélizan O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Colombo

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 217
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013