Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Colombo

Archidioecesis Columbensis in Taprobane



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 22 May 1972
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sri Lanka
  • Square Kilometers: 3,838 (1,482 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofcolombo.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 976 Gnanartha Pradeepaya Mawatha, Colombo 8, Sri Lanka
  • Telephone: (011)2695-471/2/3
  • Fax: 2692-009

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ceylon
3 December 1834ErectedDiocese of Ceylon (erected)
Diocese of Colombo
17 February 1845Name ChangedDiocese of Ceylon Diocese of Colombo
Archdiocese of Colombo
1 September 1886ElevatedDiocese of Colombo Archdiocese of Colombo
7 June 1887ElevatedArchdiocese of Colombo (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon
6 December 1944Name ChangedArchdiocese of Colombo Archdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon
Archdiocese of Colombo
22 May 1972Name ChangedArchdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon Archdiocese of Colombo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon
1950291,2101,876,90415.5%381281661,75413093370ap1951
1969395,6102,840,11013.9%1021182201,7983071,10182ap1971
Archdiocese of Colombo
1980491,3033,696,00013.3%109731822,69932731,13393ap1981
1990553,6104,320,00012.8%1561092652,0892401,099105ap1991
1999547,5654,605,52711.9%2051393441,59112881,020120ap2000
2000557,3874,615,34912.1%2101413511,58712841,035123ap2001
2001567,8335,027,26811.3%2091383471,6363451,013123ap2002
2002629,1735,361,04211.7%2341383721,691335939123ap2003
2003629,1735,455,67911.5%2371353721,6912131,051123ap2004
2004648,1845,522,95611.7%2481534011,6162481,104123ap2005
2006700,0005,692,00412.3%2552685231,3383821,161123ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 7 Mar 2014