Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sampathawaduge Maxwell Grenville Silva

Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo

Titular Bishop of Lesina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1953 BornWillorawatte
25 Jul 198127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Nov 201158.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Nov 201158.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesina
11 Feb 201258.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesina

MicroData Summary for Sampathawaduge Maxwell Grenville Silva:
Bishop Sampathawaduge Maxwell Grenville Silva (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Colombo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2012
  • c34: CB, 13 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013