Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Benjamin Cardinal Cooray, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1901BornPeriyamulla Negombo
23 Jun 192927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Dec 194543.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
14 Dec 194543.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
7 Mar 194644.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
26 Jul 194745.5SucceededArchbishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
22 Feb 196563.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196563.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
2 Sep 197674.6RetiredArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
29 Oct 198886.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Thomas Benjamin Cooray:
Thomas Benjamin Cardinal Cooray O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
  • a cardinal for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 13
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015