Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony de Saram

Deceased

Bishop of Galle, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1915Born
25 Mar 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
27 Dec 196247.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
27 Dec 196247.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
25 Mar 196347.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacapae
22 Mar 196549.8AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
28 Feb 198266.7DiedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Anthony de Saram
Bishop Anthony de Saram (born , died ) Bishop of Galle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKochchikade, Negombo

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast