Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Marcus Fernando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chilaw


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1931BornTamita-Negombo
22 Dec 195625.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 196533.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 196533.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oliva
19 Aug 196533.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oliva
8 Jun 196836.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
27 Dec 197241.2SucceededBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
19 Oct 200675.0RetiredBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
24 Aug 200977.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chilaw, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Frank Marcus Fernando:
Bishop Frank Marcus Fernando (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chilaw

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013