Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Warnakulasurya Wadumestrige Devasritha Valence Mendis

Bishop of Chilaw


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1958 BornKoralawella
20 Jul 198527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
17 Jan 200546.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
2 Apr 200546.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka
19 Oct 200648.4SucceededBishop of Chilaw, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Warnakulasurya Wadumestrige Devasritha Valence Mendis:
Bishop Warnakulasurya Wadumestrige Devasritha Valence Mendis (born ) Bishop of Chilaw

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chilaw.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,842
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013