Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kingsley Swampillai

Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1936 Born
20 Dec 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
17 Mar 198346.2AppointedBishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
7 May 198346.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
3 Jul 201275.5AppointedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
3 Jun 201578.4RetiredBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
14 Jan 201679.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mannar, Sri Lanka
30 Dec 201781.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mannar, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary
Joseph Kingsley Swampillai
Bishop Joseph Kingsley Swampillai
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKayts, Diocese of Jaffna
Ordained BishopCollege Urbain de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trincomalee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,533
  • bpd/opd: CB, 9 Sep 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025