Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Leopold Raymond Peiris

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1932Born
20 Dec 195826.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 198754.7AppointedBishop of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka
18 Jul 198754.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka
14 May 200976.7RetiredBishop of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka
29 Sep 201785.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Anthony Leopold Raymond Peiris
Bishop Anthony Leopold Raymond Peiris (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kurunegala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalaeliya
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Cathedral, Kurunegala, Diocese of Kurunegala
Death PlaceKurunegala, Diocese of Kurunegala

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,258
  • d/c1: CB, 30 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018