Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicholas Marcus Fernando

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1932Born
20 Dec 195927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
21 Mar 197744.2AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
14 May 197744.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 200269.5ResignedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
10 Apr 202087.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Marcus Fernando
Archbishop Nicholas Marcus Fernando (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunnakkara
Death PlaceColombo, Archdiocese of Colombo

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 11 Apr 2020

Quantcast