Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albert Malcolm Ranjith Cardinal Patabendige Don

Archbishop of Colombo

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1947 BornPolgahawela, Sri Lanka
29 Jun 197527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
17 Jun 199143.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
17 Jun 199143.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
31 Aug 199143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
2 Nov 199548.0AppointedBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
1 Oct 200153.9ResignedBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
1 Oct 200153.9AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
29 Apr 200456.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia
29 Apr 200456.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
29 Apr 200456.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Umbriatico
10 Dec 200558.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
16 Jun 200961.6AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
5 Aug 200961.7InstalledArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
20 Nov 201063.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201063.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
13 Feb 201163.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

MicroData Summary for Albert Malcolm Ranjith Patabendige Don:
Cardinal Albert Malcolm Ranjith Patabendige Don (born ) Archbishop of Colombo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Colombo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013