Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cletus Chandrasiri Perera, O.S.B.

Bishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1947 Born
28 Feb 196517.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Feb 197123.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Aug 197325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 May 200759.6AppointedBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
11 Jul 200759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
28 Jul 200759.8InstalledBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Cletus Chandrasiri Perera
Bishop Cletus Chandrasiri Perera O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Ratnapura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeeduwa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ratnapura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2007
  • ob/c2+/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018