Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anton Ranjith Pillainayagam

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Materiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1966 Born
16 Sep 200033.9Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
13 Jul 202053.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
13 Jul 202053.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Materiana
29 Aug 202053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Materiana

MicroData Summary for Anton Ranjith Pillainayagam
Father Anton Ranjith Pillainayagam (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaffna, Diocese of Jaffna
Ordained PriestSt. Lucia, Cathedral, Colombo, Archdiocese of Colombo
Ordained BishopSt. Lucia, Cathedral, Colombo, Archdiocese of Colombo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Colombo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jul 2020

Quantcast