Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ponniah

Bishop of Batticaloa, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1952 Born
30 Apr 198027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
19 Feb 200855.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
19 Feb 200855.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
24 May 200855.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
3 Jul 201259.7AppointedBishop of Batticaloa, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ponniah
Bishop Joseph Ponniah (born ) Bishop of Batticaloa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThannamunai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Batticaloa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: CB, 3 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,748
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018