Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Zenari

Apostolic Nuncio to Syria

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1946 Born
5 Jul 197024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
12 Jul 199953.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iulium Carnicum
12 Jul 199953.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
12 Jul 199953.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
24 Jul 199953.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
25 Sep 199953.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iulium Carnicum
10 May 200458.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka
30 Dec 200862.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Syria
19 Nov 201670.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri
19 Nov 201670.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Mar 201771.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria delle Grazie alle Fornaci fuori Porta Cavalleggeri

MicroData Summary for Mario Zenari
Mario Cardinal Zenari (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Syria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca di Verona

Please contact the Cardinal through the Nunciature to Syria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,620
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Mar 2017