Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Koffi Oi Koffi

Bishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1962 BornBongouanou
4 Aug 199028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Nov 200341.7AppointedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Dec 200341.7Ordained BishopBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
3 Jan 200946.8AppointedBishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Koffi Oi Koffi:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Koffi Oi Koffi (born ) Bishop of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pedro-en-Côte d’Ivoire.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013