Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Abidjan

Archidioecesis Abidianensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean-Pierre Kutwa, Cardinal, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Côte d’Ivoire
  • Square Kilometers: 3,810 (1,471 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, av. Jean Paul II, 01 B.P. 1287, Abidjan 01, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 20.21.23.08/9
  • Fax: 20.21.40.22

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
28 June 1895ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio (erected)
17 November 1911Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Prefecture Apostolic of Korhogo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
17 November 1911ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Vicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
9 April 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Vicariate Apostolic of Sassandra (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Abidjan
9 April 1940Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Vicariate Apostolic of Abidjan
17 May 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Abidjan Prefecture Apostolic of Bouaké (erected)
Archdiocese of Abidjan
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Abidjan Archdiocese of Abidjan
13 September 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Abidjan
Diocese of Bouaké
Diocese of Katiola
Diocese of Abengourou (erected)
8 June 1982Territory LostArchdiocese of Abidjan Diocese of Grand-Bassam (erected)
8 June 1982Territory LostArchdiocese of Abidjan Diocese of Yopougon (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Abidjan
195093,810751,00012.5%56561,6756424ap1951
Archdiocese of Abidjan
1959140,7301963821,716107424ap1960
1969260,000900,00028.9%40961361,91112813235ap1971
1980375,0002,347,00016.0%67901572,388113718546ap1981
1990636,0001,329,00047.9%61611225,21313110426ap1991
1999750,0002,500,00030.0%104871913,92635326534ap2000
2000750,0002,500,00030.0%104801844,07630626536ap2001
2001750,0002,500,00030.0%171632343,205132927242ap2002
2002750,0002,500,00030.0%102651674,49129027643ap2003
2003750,0002,500,00030.0%139601993,76828516645ap2004
2004750,0002,500,00030.0%136742103,571127927144ap2005
2005762,0002,540,00030.0%1581002582,953145126548ap2006
2006859,0002,616,00032.8%2351353702,32158232055ap2007
20111,987,0003,013,00065.9%2161643805,22859732565ap2012
20122,043,0003,098,00065.9%204722767,40251430867ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Jun 2014