Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Essoh Yedoh

Bishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1963 Born
8 Dec 199027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
28 Jun 201956.3AppointedBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
28 Sep 201956.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Bruno Essoh Yedoh
Bishop Bruno Essoh Yedoh (born ) Bishop of Bondoukou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrbaff, Archdiocese of Abidjan
Ordained BishopImam Ali Timité Stadium, Bondoukou, Diocese of Bondoukou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bondoukou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 Sep 2019

Quantcast