Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salomon Lezoutié

Coadjutor Bishop of Yopougon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1958 BornYopougon
23 Jul 198931.3Ordained PriestPriest of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
29 Jul 200547.3AppointedBishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire
8 Oct 200547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire
3 Jan 200950.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Salomon Lezoutié:
Bishop Salomon Lezoutié (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Yopougon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yopougon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,998
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013