Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Daniel Dadiet

Archbishop Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1952 Born
8 Jul 197926.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 199845.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
22 May 199845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitipa
11 Oct 199846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitipa
10 Oct 200250.0AppointedBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
12 May 200451.6AppointedArchbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
11 Jul 200451.8InstalledArchbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
12 Oct 201765.0ResignedArchbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Marie-Daniel Dadiet
Archbishop Marie-Daniel Dadiet (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Korhogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolilié
Ordained BishopSanctuaire marial de Napié, Korhogo, Archdiocese of Korhogo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Korhogo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,443
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018