Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal Yago

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1916³Born
1 May 194730.8Ordained PriestPriest of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
5 Apr 196043.7AppointedArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
8 May 196043.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
2 Feb 198366.5Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198366.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
19 Dec 199478.4RetiredArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
5 Oct 199781.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Yago (VIAF: 42690058)
Bernard Cardinal Yago (born Jul 1916, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan

EventPlace
Birth PlacePass

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017