Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien Monsi-Agboka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abomey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1926BornCotonou
21 Dec 195731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cotonou, Benin
5 Apr 196336.8AppointedBishop of Abomey, Benin
21 Jul 196337.1Ordained BishopBishop of Abomey, Benin
25 Nov 200276.5RetiredBishop of Abomey, Benin
27 Apr 200881.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Abomey, Benin

MicroData Summary for Lucien Monsi-Agboka:
Bishop Lucien Monsi-Agboka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abomey

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013