Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Ganyé

Archbishop of Cotonou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1938 BornSedjé
4 Jan 196930.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cotonou, Benin
10 Jun 199557.0AppointedBishop of Dassa-Zoumé, Benin
20 Aug 199557.1Ordained BishopBishop of Dassa-Zoumé, Benin
21 Aug 201072.1AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
31 Oct 201072.3InstalledArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Antoine Ganyé:
Archbishop Antoine Ganyé (born ) Archbishop of Cotonou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cotonou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,669
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013