Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger Houngbédji, O.P.

Archbishop of Cotonou, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1963 Born
1989²25.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Aug 199229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Jun 201653.1AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
24 Sep 201653.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roger Houngbédji (VIAF: 102719327)
Archbishop Roger Houngbédji O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Cotonou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChada-Co-Anagodo
Ordained Bishopesplanade du Palais des Congrès, Cotonou, Archdiocese of Cotonou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cotonou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 30 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast