Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Kouassi

Deceased

Bishop of Bondoukou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1934BornTankessé
21 Jul 196127.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 198753.6AppointedBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
10 Jan 198854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
16 Dec 199460.9DiedBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Kouassi:
Bishop Alexandre Kouassi (died ) Bishop of Bondoukou

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,522
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015