Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Niangoran Teky

Bishop Emeritus of Man


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1932 BornBonoua
19 Mar 196128.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 199260.0AppointedBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
14 Mar 199360.2Ordained BishopBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
18 Dec 200775.0RetiredBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Joseph Niangoran Teky:
Bishop Joseph Niangoran Teky (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Man

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Man.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,060
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013