Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal Agré

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1926BornMonga
20 Jul 195327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
8 Jun 196842.2AppointedBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
3 Oct 196842.5Ordained BishopBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
8 Oct 196842.5InstalledBishop of Man, Côte d’Ivoire
6 Mar 199266.0AppointedBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
17 May 199266.2InstalledBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
19 Dec 199468.7AppointedArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
26 Feb 199568.9InstalledArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Feb 200174.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200174.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto
27 May 200175.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto
2 May 200680.1RetiredArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
9 Jun 201488.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Bernard Agré:
Bernard Cardinal Agré (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 9 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015