Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Yapo Aké

Archbishop Emeritus of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1951 Born
9 Jul 197827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
15 May 200150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
15 May 200150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
2 Sep 200150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
21 Jul 200655.2AppointedBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
23 Sep 200655.4InstalledBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Nov 200857.6AppointedArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
4 Oct 202372.4ResignedArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Joseph Yapo Aké
(WikiData: Q1544433)
Archbishop Joseph Yapo Aké (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gagnoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemni
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Cathedral, Abidjan, Archdiocese of Abidjan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gagnoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,036
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 20 May 2024