Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcellin Yao Kouadio

Bishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1960 Born
29 Dec 199030.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 200949.4AppointedBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Aug 200949.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Marcellin Yao Kouadio
Bishop Marcellin Yao Kouadio (born ) Bishop of Yamoussoukro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVavoua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yamoussoukro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,261
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018