Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Koné

Deceased

Bishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1963Born
28 Dec 199128.9Ordained PriestPriest of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
1 Jul 200946.4AppointedBishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Aug 200946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire
8 May 201956.3DiedBishop of Odienné, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Antoine Koné
Bishop Antoine Koné (born , died ) Bishop of Odienné

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerkéssedougou
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Paix, Basilica, Yamoussoukro

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,262
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 8 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 May 2019

Quantcast