Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy-Marie-Joseph Riobé

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1911Born
15 Jun 193524.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 196150.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
22 Jul 196150.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
28 Oct 196150.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia
23 May 196352.0SucceededBishop of Orléans, France
18 Jul 197867.2DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Guy-Marie-Joseph Riobé
Bishop Guy-Marie-Joseph Riobé (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018