Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Bréheret

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1912Born
29 Jun 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 196250.3AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
30 Sep 196250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
30 Jul 197260.2DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for André Bréheret
Bishop André Bréheret (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre de Montlimart

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast