Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Jean-Prosper-Bruno Boudon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1910BornMontbrun
14 Aug 193222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nancy (-Toul), France
12 Apr 195747.2AppointedBishop of Mende, France
2 Jul 195747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
14 Jul 198373.5ResignedBishop of Mende, France
26 May 199484.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for René-Jean-Prosper-Bruno Boudon:
Bishop René-Jean-Prosper-Bruno Boudon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013