Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Chevrier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cahors, France

Titular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1886Born
29 Jun 190922.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 194154.8AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
21 Nov 194155.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
21 Aug 196275.7RetiredBishop of Cahors, France
21 Aug 196275.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
4 Oct 196881.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Chevrier
Bishop Paul Chevrier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017