Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Mégnin

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1883BornSaint-Plaisir
8 Jul 190623.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 193350.9AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
6 Feb 193451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
9 May 196582.3DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Mégnin:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Mégnin (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013