Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Firmin Lamy

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1888Born
1913²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 193849.7AppointedBishop of Langres, France
21 Sep 193849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
5 Jun 193950.6DiedBishop of Langres, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Firmin Lamy (VIAF: 89173034)
Bishop Firmin Lamy (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017