Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger Lucien Meindre

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1931BornRuynes-en-Margeride
17 Mar 195624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Flour, France
14 Jul 198351.9AppointedBishop of Mende, France
8 Oct 198352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
8 Apr 198957.6AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
8 Oct 199968.1DiedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Roger Lucien Meindre:
Archbishop Roger Lucien Meindre (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013