Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Joseph Bourrat

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1925BornSaint-Martin-en-Haut
29 Jun 195025.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 197449.2AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
6 Jul 197449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
1 Jun 199166.2ResignedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
27 Jun 199166.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Roger Joseph Bourrat:
Bishop Roger Joseph Bourrat (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015