Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Bassène

Bishop of Kolda, Senegal

Apostolic Administrator of Tambacounda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1951 Born
11 Apr 198028.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 199948.3AppointedBishop of Kolda, Senegal
29 Apr 200048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kolda, Senegal
5 Aug 201766.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tambacounda, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Bassène
Bishop Jean-Pierre Bassène (born ) Bishop of Kolda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEssyl
Ordained BishopKolda, Diocese of Kolda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kolda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,749
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast